IN HB1395 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Various natural resources matters. Provides that a taxpayer who completes the preservation or rehabilitation of a historic property and obtains a certain certification is entitled to a credit of 20% or $20,000, whichever is less. Repeals certain provisions related to commercial fishing. Provides that the natural resources commission (commission) may adopt rules to electronically notify the public of rules adopted by the commission. Removes the requirement that the director of the department of natural resources (department) send, to a person who has a license that is placed on probationary status, notice that includes a description of the amount of child support in arrears and an explanation of the procedures to pay child support arrearage. Provides that the Kankakee River basin and Yellow River basin development commission may request to schedule an onsite field review for a proposed activity concerning private and mutual drains of the Kankakee River or Yellow River. Provides that wild animal permits do not apply to: (1) zoological parks; (2) circuses or carnivals; (3) research facilities and universities licensed or registered by the United States Department of Agriculture (USDA); and (4) organizations or persons temporarily housing a wild or exotic animal at the request of the department. Provides that wild animal permits also do not apply to commercial animal dealers, breeders, and exhibitors licensed by the USDA who only possess wild or exotic animals that do not require a license by the department. Provides that the department, department employees, and law enforcement officers are not liable for any damages caused by a permitted animal that escapes its enclosure and poses a threat to public safety. Provides that local floodplain administrators in counties having a population of more than 140,000 but less than 150,000 may issue a variance approving a structure located in a floodway without a permit issued by the director of the department if: (1) the structure is not used as an abode or residence; (2) the structure is constructed after January 1, 2018, but not later than July 1, 2020; and (3) the lowest floor of the structure is not more than 0.15 of a foot below two feet above the 100 year flood elevation. Provides that the department may impose and collect fees for regulating underground petroleum storage. Provides standards for contracts for the purchase of timber. Provides for damages in certain proceedings regarding the purchase of timber. Provides for additional violations of rules associated with timber buyers. Provides that timber buyers shall maintain complete and accurate records of certain transactions for five years from the date of the transaction. Provides for suspensions of timber buyers licenses for 90 day periods. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various natural resources matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Glick
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-02-17HouseAmendment #1 (Gutwein) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-15HouseRepresentative Dvorak added as coauthor
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Abbott and Bartels
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Eberhart

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1395/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/e/a/32ea7da1/HB1395.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/3/8/df38ffda/HB1395.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/a/0/d3a0473e/HB1395.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/5/0/3c50779b/HB1395.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/5/6/8c56d535/HB1395.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/6/b/666b9223/HB1395.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/4/f/874fcff7/HB1395.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/0/d/f80dc5e9/HB1395.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/d/a/a3daeb2a/HB1395.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/7/c/457cf5fc/HB1395.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/d/a/02dae4a2/HB1395.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/1/4/36147a9f/HB1395.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/1/4/3c149da8/HB1395.215_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback