IN HB1392 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Occupational licensure of military spouses. Amends as follows the law under which a provisional occupational license may be issued to the spouse of an active duty member of the armed forces assigned to Indiana: (1) Provides that the law applies to the spouse of any active military service member, including a member of a reserve component of the United States armed forces or a member of the National Guard. (2) Eliminates a provision under which a military spouse applying for a provisional occupational license is required to submit to a national criminal history background check, and provides instead that a military spouse applying for a provisional occupational license must be determined by the appropriate professional board to not have a disqualifying criminal history if a national criminal history background check is required for the regulated occupation for which the military spouse seeks a provisional license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensure of military spouses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HousePublic Law 116
2021-04-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 419: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-04-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-16SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2021-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Buchanan and Niezgodski
2021-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-11HouseRepresentative Andrade M added as coauthor
2021-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Frye R and Judy
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Zent

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1392/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/f/9/f4f98166/HB1392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/f/6/09f6bd31/HB1392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/4/4/bc44e70c/HB1392.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/1/3/a113d0d1/HB1392.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/4/f/c44fcb5c/HB1392.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/1/3/8413c282/HB1392.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/e/f/35efe043/HB1392.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/8/d/918d15f5/HB1392.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/6/e/c66efd8a/HB1392.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/5/2/47521fb7/HB1392.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/0/a/8e0ae2c7/HB1392.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/8/f/768fbd25/HB1392.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/5/c/5e5cd61c/HB1392.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/b/4/bbb448f1/HB1392.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/4/4/4e445d6d/HB1392.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/e/4/40e48b40/HB1392.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/b/d/42bd10f1/HB1392.03.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/2/e/902edbaa/HB1392.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/a/5/04a5c862/HB1392.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/2/4/e324ebfb/HB1392.195_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/6/5/54650959/HB1392.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/5/0/c0508374/HB1392.265_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/1/b/d81ba87e/HB1392.419_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback