IN HB1384 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 251
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various education matters. Provides that before July 1, 2018, the state board of education (state board) shall establish a definition of a high mobility school for schools with a high concentration of mobile students. Provides that for each school year beginning after June 30, 2018, the department of education (department) shall make a report regarding the performance of high mobility schools and post the report on the department's Internet web site. Provides that for purposes of calculating a school's category or designation of school improvement, the state board shall consider the mobility of high school students who are credit deficient

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various education matters. Provides that before July 1, 2018, the state board of education (state board) shall establish a definition of a high mobility school for schools with a high concentration of mobile students. Provides that for each school year beginning after June 30, 2018, the department of education (department) shall make a report regarding the performance of high mobility schools and post the report on the department's Internet web site. Provides that for purposes of calculating a school's category or designation of school improvement, the state board shall consider the mobility of high school students who are credit deficient

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Melton) failed (Y: 9 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Amendment #4 (DeLaney) prevailed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 251
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 529: yeas 38, nays 12
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 549: yeas 68, nays 30
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSenator Kruse added as conferee
2017-04-21SenateSenator Kruse removed as advisor
2017-04-21SenateSenator Melton removed as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative DeVon added as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative DeVon removed as advisor
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Smith V removed as conferee
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Kruse, Stoops, Bassler, Crane and Zay
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
2017-04-12HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cook, DeVon, DeLaney, Errington and Pryor
2017-04-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
2017-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-11HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-05SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 36, nays 12
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #1 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 336: yeas 9, nays 37
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-20SenateSenator Bassler added as cosponsor
2017-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2017-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Kruse
2017-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 60, nays 32
2017-02-22HouseAmendment #4 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 194: yeas 91, nays 2
2017-02-22HouseAmendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 193: yeas 31, nays 60
2017-02-22HouseAmendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 192: yeas 30, nays 63
2017-02-22HouseAmendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; Roll Call 191: yeas 92, nays 0
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1384/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/6/e/a86e14c1/HB1384.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/0/2/2502184f/HB1384.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/7/d/6f7d0f50/HB1384.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/c/b/67cb0591/HB1384.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/1/f/061f14c8/HB1384.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/e/d/5aed260c/HB1384.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/8/c/e58c2468/HB1384.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/7/b/987b7022/HB1384.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/3/a/3f3adb64/HB1384.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/1/8/3b18447f/HB1384.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/6/a/d36ad8a8/HB1384.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/3/8/b9381f40/HB1384.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/c/8/38c8d3a7/HB1384.191.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/b/3/b5b315cb/HB1384.192.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/4/7/ca47c13d/HB1384.193.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/5/9/bf59d298/HB1384.194.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/6/9/7d6960cf/HB1384.222.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/3/b/753bc593/HB1384.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/b/8/5ab81e47/HB1384.336.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/c/cd2c2d34/HB1384.373.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/2/e/d82e0ba3/HB1384.529.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/5/0/91502c7b/HB1384.549.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback