IN HB1380 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Representative Clere added as coauthor
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid reimbursement for tubal ligation study. Requires that, before August 1, 2019, the office of the secretary of family and social services (office of the secretary) study Medicaid reimbursement rates for tubal ligation procedures and sets forth requirements for the study. Requires the office of the secretary to present the results of the study to the budget committee before October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid reimbursement for tubal ligation study. Requires that, before August 1, 2019, the office of the secretary of family and social services (office of the secretary) study Medicaid reimbursement rates for tubal ligation procedures and sets forth requirements for the study. Requires the office of the secretary to present the results of the study to the budget committee before October 1, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-01-28HouseRepresentative Barrett added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Fleming

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback