IN HB1380 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana housing first program. Establishes the Indiana housing first program (program) to provide housing and support services for eligible homeless persons. Provides that the housing and community development authority (authority) shall administer the program. Requires the authority to establish, not later than January 1, 2017, policies and procedures to implement and administer the program. Provides that the policies and procedures must, among other requirements, include: (1) a plan for moving eligible homeless persons into housing directly from the streets or emergency shelter care without a precondition of accepting or complying with certain requirements; and (2) partnerships with private and public
Title
Indiana housing first program. Establishes the Indiana housing first program (program) to provide housing and support services for eligible homeless persons. Provides that the housing and community development authority (authority) shall administer the program. Requires the authority to establish, not later than January 1, 2017, policies and procedures to implement and administer the program. Provides that the policies and procedures must, among other requirements, include: (1) a plan for moving eligible homeless persons into housing directly from the streets or emergency shelter care without a precondition of accepting or complying with certain requirements; and (2) partnerships with private and public
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | Representatives Bartlett and Frizzell added as coauthors |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2016-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative Kirchhofer |
2016-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Harris D |