IN HB1380 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain calculations concerning the capture of state revenue in a motorsports investment district are based on calendar years rather than state fiscal years. Requires the Indiana motorsports commission to establish a motorsports facility fund if a motorsports investment district is established. Provides that during the term of the written agreement the commission shall each state fiscal year deposit in the motorsports facility fund at least $2,000,000 solely from payments by the motorsports facility owners. Provides that the motorsports facility fund reverts to the state general fund on June 30 of each year. Requires the commission to request an appropriation in each state fiscal year that the written agreement is in effect equal to the amount deposited into the motorsports facility fund. Provides that the amount of the appropriation must be deposited into the motorsports investment district fund. Requires the department of state revenue to annually notify entities of the incremental tax amounts and the reversion amount from the motorsports facility fund. Provides that an entity is not considered to have Indiana income for purposes of the state income tax merely because of certain logistics activities concerning the distribution of legend drugs, medical devices, or medical supplies that are conducted in Indiana by a third-party logistics provider. Repeals the following income tax credits: (1) Prison investment credit. (2) Riverboat building credit. (3) Blended biodiesel credit. (4) Ethanol production credit. (5) Voluntary remediation tax credit. (6) Energy savings tax credit. (7) New employer tax credit. Allows a taxpayer whose qualified investment to build or refurbish a riverboat is certified by the Indiana economic development corporation before
Title
State and local tax matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 138002 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 138001 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 138002 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 138001 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 522: yeas 67 and nays 30 |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 190 |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative Thompson added as conferee |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative Thompson removed as advisor |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative Porter removed as conferee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 468: yeas 40 and nays 8 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hume added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Goodin added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Stemler added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Ober added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Porter added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Turner added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 338: yeas 41 and nays 6 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Holdman added second sponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1380 Amendment #5 (Kenley), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1380 Amendment #4 (Kenley), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1380 Amendment #3 (Kenley), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1380 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | House | Representative C. Brown added as coauthor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 206: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Hershman added as first sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Turner. |