IN HB1378 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state police department to make a report to the criminal law and sentencing policy study committee, or another study committee as determined by the legislative council, concerning familial DNA searches in criminal investigations.
Title
Familial DNA searches.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Cox [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 137802 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 137801 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 137802 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 137801 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 189 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 409: yeas 84 and nays 3 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 337: yeas 45 and nays 3 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Steele added second sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 91 and nays 1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Zakas added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Gutwein added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Cox. |
2014-01-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative McMillin |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |