IN HB1376 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the following changes to the statute concerning telephone caller identification services: (1) Repeals the definition of "telecommunications service provider". (2) Adds the definition of "provider". In the statutes concerning: (1) telephone caller identification services; and (2) telephone solicitations; replaces the term "caller ID" with the term "caller identification", as used in the federal Caller ID Act of 2009. Provides that a person shall not knowingly and with the intent to defraud or cause harm to another person, or to wrongfully obtain anything of value, cause any caller identification service to transmit misleading or inaccurate caller identification information to a subscriber in Indiana. Exempts certain activities from the prohibition. Provides that a violation of the prohibition is: (1) a Class B misdemeanor; and (2) a deceptive act actionable by the attorney general. Specifies that the attorney general may recover a civil penalty of not more than $10,000 for a knowing violation. Provides that a subsequent violation is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides a cause of action for: (1) damages; and (2) injunctive relief; for any person aggrieved by a violation. Prohibits the professional licensing agency (PLA) or a board administered by the PLA from disclosing to the public personal information of an individual who: (1) applies for or holds a license, certificate, registration, or permit issued by a board; or (2) is a member of a board administered by the PLA; subject to certain exceptions specified by law. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Various privacy issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Timothy Neese [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 151 |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | Representative Neese added as coauthor |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 506: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senator Delph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 320: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senators Waterman, Tomes and Randolph added as cosponsors |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-02-11 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Steele |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |