IN HB1373 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certified public accountant examination. Requires a first time examination candidate for the certified public accountant (CPA) examination to have at least 120 semester hours of college education that includes an accounting concentration or equivalent. Requires a candidate for an initial issuance of a CPA certificate to have at least 150 semester hours of college education or equivalent and a baccalaureate or higher degree from a college or university that must include an accounting concentration or equivalent. Postpones the expiration of a noncode SECTION that was enacted in 2020 and that requires the board of accountancy to adopt certain administrative rules concerning the CPA examination. Voids a section of the administrative rules of the board of accountancy concerning the CPA examination and temporarily replaces that section of the rules with a noncode provision that: (1) allows the successor to the Uniform CPA examination to be administered to CPA candidates; and (2) eliminates the requirement that the four sections of the examination administered to CPA candidates be the four sections specified in the voided administrative rule section.
Title
Certified public accountant examination.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Public Law 59 |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 85, nays 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Zay |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Representative Hatfield added as coauthor |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Carbaugh |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative VanNatter |