IN HB1373 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Circuit court clerks. Requires payment of a fee for filing a petition with a court for expungement of a person's record of arrest or conviction. Allows a court to waive the fee for filing if the court finds that the petitioner is indigent. Requires a person who requests a circuit court clerk to send an additional mailing by registered or certified mail to provide: (1) an addressed envelope with postage prepaid; (2) the United States Postal Service forms for registered or certified mail; and (3) the United States Postal Service fee for service by registered or certified mail. Provides that

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Circuit court clerks. Requires payment of a fee for filing a petition with a court for expungement of a person's record of arrest or conviction. Allows a court to waive the fee for filing if the court finds that the petitioner is indigent. Requires a person who requests a circuit court clerk to send an additional mailing by registered or certified mail to provide: (1) an addressed envelope with postage prepaid; (2) the United States Postal Service forms for registered or certified mail; and (3) the United States Postal Service fee for service by registered or certified mail. Provides that

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-11HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-10HouseSenator Young, M. added as sponsor
2015-02-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 98, nays 0
2015-02-09HouseAmendment #1 (McMillin) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-09HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-05HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Richardson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback