IN HB1371 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public officials, liens, and restricted addresses. Provides that, for purposes of the law concerning common law liens, a public official includes former officeholders. Creates a definition for "public employee". Provides if a person notifies the county recorder that the person is a public official or public employee, a common law lien that is recorded on the person's property is automatically void after 30 days if the lienholder has not commenced suit on the lien. (Under current law, a person must file an affidavit of service of notice with the county recorder in order to release the lien.) Prohibits a person
Title
Public officials, liens, and restricted addresses. Provides that, for purposes of the law concerning common law liens, a public official includes former officeholders. Creates a definition for "public employee". Provides if a person notifies the county recorder that the person is a public official or public employee, a common law lien that is recorded on the person's property is automatically void after 30 days if the lienholder has not commenced suit on the lien. (Under current law, a person must file an affidavit of service of notice with the county recorder in order to release the lien.) Prohibits a person
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Richardson [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 191 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 558: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 584: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Young R Michael and Broden |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Steele and Taylor |
2015-04-23 | House | House Advisors appointed: Washburne, Bartlett and Harris D |
2015-04-23 | House | House Conferees appointed: Richardson and Riecken |
2015-04-23 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 379: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Young, M. added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Richardson |