IN HB1371 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the joint study committee on transportation and infrastructure assessment and solutions. Sets forth the membership of the committee. Provides that the committee operates under policies adopted by the legislative council. Provides that the committee expires January 1, 2016. Repeals law establishing the joint study committee on mass transit and transportation alternatives.
Title
Joint committee on transportation infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 5 | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-03-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-03-16 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-03-15 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-15 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-15 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 43 and nays 6 | |
2011-03-14 | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-08 | Senator Wyss added as second sponsor | |
2011-03-08 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2011-02-03 | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2011-01-18 | Coauthored by Representatives Dembowski, Saunders and Davis | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Soliday |