IN HB1369 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unnecessary, unused law reports. Requires every state agency to compile and report to the legislative council a list of all state laws administered by the state agency that the state agency considers to be in need of change because the laws are no longer necessary or used.
Title
Unnecessary, unused law reports. Requires every state agency to compile and report to the legislative council a list of all state laws administered by the state agency that the state agency considers to be in need of change because the laws are no longer necessary or used.
Sponsors
Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Rep. Patrick Bauer [D] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Public Law 89 |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 466: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senators Zakas and Kruse added as cosponsors |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 417: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senator Koch added as cosponsor |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as cosponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | Representatives GiaQuinta and Bauer added as coauthors |
2017-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker and Head |
2017-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 100, nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2017-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative Gutwein |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Smith M |