IN HB1365 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes sentencing alternatives for courts with criminal jurisdiction for: (1) offenders who are less than 18 years of age who have been waived from a juvenile court to a court with criminal jurisdiction and who are charged as adult offenders; and (2) offenders who are less than 18 years of age who do not come under the jurisdiction of a juvenile court because the offenders are charged with certain criminal offenses. Provides that if such an offender is convicted of committing a felony or pleads guilty to committing a felony, a criminal court may: (1) impose an appropriate criminal sentence on the offender; (2) suspend the criminal sentence imposed; (3) order the offender to be placed into the custody of the department of correction to be placed in a juvenile facility of the division of youth services, if the department agrees to the placement; and (4) provide that the successful completion of the placement of the offender in the juvenile facility is a condition of the suspended criminal sentence. Provides that when an offender becomes 18 years of age, the sentencing court must hold a review hearing concerning the offender before the offender becomes 19 years of age. Allows the sentencing court, after the review hearing, to: (1) discharge the offender if the sentencing court finds that the objectives of the sentence imposed on the offender have been met; (2) order execution of all or part of the offender's suspended criminal sentence in an adult facility of the department of correction; or (3) place the offender in home detention, in a community corrections program, on probation, or in any other appropriate alternative sentencing program.
Title
Sentencing alternatives for youthful offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and M. Young | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-01-26 | Representative Pierce added as coauthor | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 1 (McNamara), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2012-01-11 | Coauthored by Representatives Steuerwald and Dermody | |
2012-01-11 | Authored by Representative McNamara |