IN HB1363 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of child services matters. Repeals provisions under which certain parties may file a petition during a child in need of services proceeding to require a parent, guardian, or custodian of the child to participate in a program of care, treatment, or rehabilitation for the child. Provides that a party that receives notice of a motion filed by the department of child services (department) to change the out-of-home placement of a child has ten days (rather then 15 days, under current law) to file a written objection and initiate a hearing regarding the motion. Requires the department to file a motion with a juvenile court in order to change the out-of-home placement of a child who: (1) has been in the same out-of-home placement for one year or more; and (2) is in a foster family home or in the care of a relative. Allows the person with whom a child is placed to waive the person's right to contest a motion filed by the department to change the child's placement, and allows the juvenile court to make an expedited ruling on the motion if the court is provided with written notice of the person's waiver. Provides that a child is a child in need of services if the child is a victim of certain offenses committed by a parent, guardian, or custodian of the child. Provides for a defense to prosecution for possession of child pornography for: (1) a department employee acting within the scope of the employee's duties; and (2) an attorney acting in the attorney's capacity as legal counsel for a client. Specifies that costs paid from COVID-19 federal stimulus funds may not be disallowed when setting rates for 2023.Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally produces, disseminates, or possesses with intent to disseminate an image that depicts or describes sexual conduct: (1) by a child who the person knows is less than 18 years of age; (2) by a child or a person who appears to be a child, if the image is obscene; or (3) that is simulated sexual conduct involving a representation that appears to be a child, if the representation of the image is obscene; commits the offense of child exploitation. Provides that a person who, with intent to view the image, knowingly or intentionally possesses or accesses an image that depicts or describes sexual conduct: (1) by a child who the person knows is less than 18 years of age; (2) by a child or a person who appears to be a child, if the image is obscene; or (3) that is simulated sexual conduct involving a representation that appears to be a child, if the representation of the image is obscene; commits the offense of possession of child pornography. Specifies that it is not a required element of the offense of child exploitation or possession of child pornography that the child depicted actually exists under certain circumstances. Defines "image". Provides for a defense to prosecution for possession of child pornography for: (1) a department of child services employee acting within the scope of the employee's duties; and (2) an attorney acting in the attorney's capacity as legal counsel for a client. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Department of child services matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Public Law 172 |
2022-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 368: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Koch and Randolph Lonnie M |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Walker G and Pol |
2022-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: DeVon, Lauer, Hamilton and Hatfield |
2022-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Young J and Summers |
2022-03-03 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker G and Koch |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Young J |