IN HB1362 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Peer to peer vehicle sharing. Defines peer to peer vehicle sharing. Provides requirements for a peer to peer (P2P) vehicle sharing program. Provides that a shared vehicle may not be shared on a peer to peer vehicle program if any safety recalls have not been repaired. Provides insurance requirements for a shared vehicle if the vehicle will be shared on a peer to peer vehicle sharing program. Provides that a P2P vehicle sharing program is responsible for maintaining liability insurance coverage during the car sharing period for a vehicle shared through the P2P vehicle sharing program. Provides that a P2P vehicle sharing program shall assume liability of a shared vehicle owner for any bodily injury or property damage to third parties or uninsured and underinsured motorist losses during the car sharing period in an amount stated in the car sharing agreement, which may not be less than the minimum amount set forth in the financial responsibility statute. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles may not suspend the driving privileges of a shared vehicle owner for failure to submit proof of financial responsibility at the time an accident occurred if the vehicle was shared through a peer to peer vehicle sharing program at the time the accident occurred. Provides that a political subdivision may not enact or enforce an ordinance, resolution, policy, or rule to regulate peer to peer vehicle sharing. Allows the board of an airport authority or a board of aviation commissioners to enact or enforce an ordinance, resolution, policy, or rule regulating P2P vehicle sharing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer to peer vehicle sharing. Defines peer to peer vehicle sharing. Provides requirements for a peer to peer (P2P) vehicle sharing program. Provides that a shared vehicle may not be shared on a peer to peer vehicle program if any safety recalls have not been repaired. Provides insurance requirements for a shared vehicle if the vehicle will be shared on a peer to peer vehicle sharing program. Provides that a P2P vehicle sharing program is responsible for maintaining liability insurance coverage during the car sharing period for a vehicle shared through the P2P vehicle sharing program. Provides that a P2P vehicle sharing program shall assume liability of a shared vehicle owner for any bodily injury or property damage to third parties or uninsured and underinsured motorist losses during the car sharing period in an amount stated in the car sharing agreement, which may not be less than the minimum amount set forth in the financial responsibility statute. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles may not suspend the driving privileges of a shared vehicle owner for failure to submit proof of financial responsibility at the time an accident occurred if the vehicle was shared through a peer to peer vehicle sharing program at the time the accident occurred. Provides that a political subdivision may not enact or enforce an ordinance, resolution, policy, or rule to regulate peer to peer vehicle sharing. Allows the board of an airport authority or a board of aviation commissioners to enact or enforce an ordinance, resolution, policy, or rule regulating P2P vehicle sharing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 253
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 586: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 605: yeas 90, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-22SenateSenate advisors appointed: Garten and Melton
2019-04-22SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Ford J.D.
2019-04-22HouseHouse advisors appointed: Sullivan, Karickhoff and Candelaria Reardon
2019-04-22HouseHouse conferees appointed: Eberhart and Chyung
2019-04-18HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-18HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 488: yeas 43, nays 2
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2019-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 84, nays 12
2019-02-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseRepresentatives Forestal and Lehman added as coauthors
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative VanNatter
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Eberhart

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1362/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/3/5/53353852/HB1362.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/0/4/1004190f/HB1362.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/7/0/a4703966/HB1362.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/c/e3ac8621/HB1362.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/2/3/cf236670/HB1362.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/9/7/1f973336/HB1362.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/d/3/cfd3a042/HB1362.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/c/3/d7c312bb/HB1362.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/c/6/ffc6bcdf/HB1362.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/c/4/eac49782/HB1362.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/9/6/b896b860/HB1362.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/5/4/cb54ede4/HB1362.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/5/b/1c5b9b8b/HB1362.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/6/0/cf608f96/HB1362.290.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/1/9/e9196a85/HB1362.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/2/e/ee2eb230/HB1362.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/0/6/a5066f6a/HB1362.488.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/5/2/02526e95/HB1362.586.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/9/d/739d84de/HB1362.605.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback