IN HB1359 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 244: yeas 44, nays 51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Immunizations. Requires the state department of health (department) to establish a program to provide information about the human papillomavirus (HPV) to parents, health care providers, and other individuals approved to administer the HPV vaccine and to establish goals and plans to increase the vaccination rate for the HPV infection. Requires the department to prepare an annual report concerning the program. Repeals and relocates the immunization laws from the education laws to the health laws. Requires a school to provide parents of grade 6 students information concerning the HPV infection. (Current law requires the information to be provided to the parents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunizations. Requires the state department of health (department) to establish a program to provide information about the human papillomavirus (HPV) to parents, health care providers, and other individuals approved to administer the HPV vaccine and to establish goals and plans to increase the vaccination rate for the HPV infection. Requires the department to prepare an annual report concerning the program. Repeals and relocates the immunization laws from the education laws to the health laws. Requires a school to provide parents of grade 6 students information concerning the HPV infection. (Current law requires the information to be provided to the parents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 244: yeas 44, nays 51
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Clere, Kirchhofer, Shackleford
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Errington

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback