IN HB1359 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a redevelopment commission to establish a program for age-restricted housing. Specifies the findings that the redevelopment commission must make before adopting the age-restricted housing program. Provides that all of the rights, powers, privileges, and immunities that may be exercised by a redevelopment commission in blighted, deteriorated, or deteriorating areas may be exercised by the redevelopment commission in implementing its program for age-restricted housing, including levying a special tax, issuing bonds or entering into leases, and allocating incremental property tax revenue.
Title
Age-restricted housing programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 7 |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 261: yeas 41 and nays 7 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-11 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Broden |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 79, nays 17 |
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Moed removed as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Representatives Moed, Truitt and Bacon added as coauthors |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Huston |