IN HB1358 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the law concerning the health care facility advisory council. Transfers certain duties of the council to the state department of health. Adds certain persons to qualify as representatives for physician order for treatment forms. Changes the amount of time from four years after birth to twelve months after birth that a birth certificate presented for filing is considered a delayed certificate of birth. Requires a diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder at any age to be reported to the birth problems registry. (Current law provides for the reporting of an autism diagnosis made before a child's fifth birthday). Allows not more than 50% of the monies in the spinal cord and brain injury fund to be used to develop a statewide trauma system. Allows not more than 50% of the monies in the spinal cord and brain injury fund to be used to develop a statewide trauma system. Requires the state department of health to: (1) adopt rules concerning the regulation of facilities for treatment of traumatic brain injuries; and (2) make recommendations to the legislative council and health finance commission concerning food handling law changes. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Extends the office of minority health until July 1, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 135802 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 135801 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 135802 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 135801 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 500: yeas 100 and nays 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 141 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 459: yeas 45 and nays 3 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Becker added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Shackleford added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Davisson added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Frizzell added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative C. Brown added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Clere added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 265: yeas 45 and nays 3 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Bauer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Errington added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 101: yeas 92 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Breaux added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Miller Patricia added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Frizzell added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative C. Brown. |