IN HB1357 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
School administrators.
Title
School administrators.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Eric Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 5 (Rogers), rejected (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Amendment 3 (V. Smith), failed (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 5 (Rogers), rejected (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Amendment 3 (V. Smith), failed (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 167 |
2013-05-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 558: yeas 55, nays 40 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 437: yeas 26 and nays 25 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 5 (Rogers), rejected; Roll Call 410: yeas 17, nays 33 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senator Banks added as second sponsor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Pete Miller |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 57, nays 41 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment 3 (V. Smith), failed; Roll Call 52: yeas 31, nays 66 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment 2 (McNamara), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative Turner |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Huston |