IN HB1353 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

President Benjamin Harrison conservation trust. Renames the Indiana heritage trust fund as the President Benjamin Harrison conservation trust fund (trust fund). Makes various changes to the purposes of the trust fund. Makes changes to the uses of the accounts within the trust fund. Repeals the Indiana heritage trust committee. Specifies the membership and purposes of the President Benjamin Harrison conservation trust project committee (project committee). Provides for the appointment of four members of the general assembly as nonvoting members of the project committee. Adds the chairperson of the board of directors of the natural resources foundation to the project committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

President Benjamin Harrison conservation trust. Renames the Indiana heritage trust fund as the President Benjamin Harrison conservation trust fund (trust fund). Makes various changes to the purposes of the trust fund. Makes changes to the uses of the accounts within the trust fund. Repeals the Indiana heritage trust committee. Specifies the membership and purposes of the President Benjamin Harrison conservation trust project committee (project committee). Provides for the appointment of four members of the general assembly as nonvoting members of the project committee. Adds the chairperson of the board of directors of the natural resources foundation to the project committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23HousePublic Law 172
2016-03-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 403: yeas 94, nays 0
2016-03-08HouseDissent withdrawn
2016-03-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Glick and Tallian
2016-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Stoops
2016-03-03HouseHouse advisors appointed: Thompson, Sullivan and Kersey
2016-03-03HouseHouse conferees appointed: Karickhoff and Pierce
2016-03-02HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2016-03-02HouseMotion to dissent filed
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-15SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2016-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-01HouseCosponsor: Senator Kruse
2016-02-01HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Crider, Glick, Tallian
2016-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 95, nays 0
2016-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-12HouseCoauthored by Representatives Eberhart, Pierce and Kersey
2016-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Karickhoff

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1353/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/0/6/b8063e2f/HB1353.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/5/b/785b6260/HB1353.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/3/9/7139f4fa/HB1353.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/d/0/96d0031b/HB1353.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/a/8/a1a8298f/HB1353.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/5/7/da571fec/HB1353.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/9/b/839b626e/HB1353.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/b/3/83b32d0b/HB1353.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/0/e/560ed6d1/HB1353.95.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/9/0/db90577c/HB1353.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/9/6/b59677a9/HB1353.299.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/5/b6452ca5/HB1353.403.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback