IN HB1352 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax administration. Provides that a marketplace facilitator is required to collect and remit state sales tax as a retail merchant when it facilitates a retail transaction for sellers on the marketplace facilitator's marketplace. Specifies circumstances in which a marketplace facilitator or a seller would not be required to collect and remit the state sales tax on the retail sale. Retains provisions that go into effect on July 1, 2019, for state sales tax collection and remittance requirements of an accommodations facilitator that facilitates a retail transaction for sellers that rent or furnish rooms, lodgings, or accommodations in Indiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax administration. Provides that a marketplace facilitator is required to collect and remit state sales tax as a retail merchant when it facilitates a retail transaction for sellers on the marketplace facilitator's marketplace. Specifies circumstances in which a marketplace facilitator or a seller would not be required to collect and remit the state sales tax on the retail sale. Retains provisions that go into effect on July 1, 2019, for state sales tax collection and remittance requirements of an accommodations facilitator that facilitates a retail transaction for sellers that rent or furnish rooms, lodgings, or accommodations in Indiana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseCosponsor: Senator Taylor G
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Tallian and Messmer
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 86, nays 4
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentatives Huston, Campbell, Brown, T. added as coauthors
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Porter

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback