IN HB1351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disclosure or notification of data breach. Adds a requirement that disclosure or notice must occur not more than 45 days after the discovery of a breach.
Title
Disclosure or notification of data breach.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Public Law 171 |
2022-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second sponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reread second time: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Busch |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Representative Lauer added as coauthor |
2022-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |