IN HB1351 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motorized equipment vehicle rental excise tax. Excludes certain motorized equipment vehicles from the assessment of the personal property tax. Imposes an excise tax on the rental of those motorized equipment vehicles (excise tax). Provides procedures for the sourcing, collection, and distribution of the excise tax. Provides that the excise tax is apportioned and distributed to local governmental units in the same manner that property taxes are apportioned and distributed.
Title
Motorized equipment vehicle rental excise tax. Excludes certain motorized equipment vehicles from the assessment of the personal property tax. Imposes an excise tax on the rental of those motorized equipment vehicles (excise tax). Provides procedures for the sourcing, collection, and distribution of the excise tax. Provides that the excise tax is apportioned and distributed to local governmental units in the same manner that property taxes are apportioned and distributed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-13 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 89, nays 2 |
2017-02-09 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Huston |