IN HB1350 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Niezgodski
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Indiana ABLE account. Allows a taxpayer to make a one-time transfer from a particular college choice 529 education savings plan account to an Indiana ABLE 529A savings plan without being subject to the requirement for the repayment of tax credits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana ABLE account. Allows a taxpayer to make a one-time transfer from a particular college choice 529 education savings plan account to an Indiana ABLE 529A savings plan without being subject to the requirement for the repayment of tax credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Niezgodski
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Houchin and Breaux
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Heaton, Hamilton and Porter
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Clere and Harris
2019-04-18HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-17HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 487: yeas 45, nays 0
2019-04-15SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseCosponsor: Senator Ruckelshaus
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Houchin, Charbonneau and Breaux
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-28HouseRepresentative Heaton added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Schaibley and Porter
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback