IN HB1350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person from distributing agricultural or vegetable seed if the test to determine the percentage of germination has not been completed within the 12 month period before distribution. (Current law requires the test to be performed within nine months of distribution.)
Title
Agricultural seed testing.
Sponsors
Rep. James Baird [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Sen. Richard Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 135002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Roll Call 135001 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 135002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Roll Call 135001 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 17 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 204: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-01-30 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 160: yeas 90 and nays 0 |
2014-01-29 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Baird. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-01-14 | House | Representatives Lehe and Gutwein added as coauthors. |