IN HB1348 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the following changes in the statutes governing soil and water conservation districts: (1) Amends the statement of the general assembly's policy on the management of soil and water resources to include the goal of protecting and improving soil quality. (2) Eliminates the condition that, to be an elected supervisor on the governing body of a district, an individual must occupy a tract of land larger than ten acres. (3) Changes certain voting procedures. (4) Requires the supervisors of a district to provide supervision for employees of the district. (5) Generally authorizes the use of money in the clean water Indiana fund to qualify for federal matching funds. (Under current law, the fund can be used to qualify for federal matching funds only if the federal matching funds are for county soil survey computerization.) Permits the board of directors of a conservancy district to adopt a resolution authorizing the financial clerk of the district to make claim payments for certain expenses in advance of allowances by the board.
Title
Soil and water conservation districts and conservancy districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 129 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 672: yeas 88, nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-05 | Amendment 4 (Lawson), prevailed; | |
2011-04-05 | Amendment 3 (Nugent), failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 23, nays 27 | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-03 | Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Arnold | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-25 | Representative Cheatham added as coauthor | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Eberhart |