IN HB1347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipally owned utilities. Provides that all rates, charges, and other fees for services rendered by a municipally owned utility (other than services rendered by a municipally owned sewer utility or by a department of public utilities for a consolidated city) to property occupied by someone other than the owner are payable by the person occupying the property if the account or other customer or billing records maintained by the utility for the property indicate that: (1) the property is occupied by someone other than the owner; and (2) the person occupying the property is responsible for paying the rates, charges, and fees. Provides that upon applying for utility service from a municipally owned utility, the person occupying the property shall provide the utility with the name and contact information of the owner or manager of the property. Provides that rates, charges, and fees assessed by a municipally owned utility with respect to property occupied by someone other than the owner do not constitute a lien against the property. Specifies that these provisions do not: (1) prohibit a municipal legislative body from imposing any requirement to: (A) ensure payment by; or (B) the creditworthiness of; the person occupying the property; or (2) abrogate or limit the authority of the owner of a multi-unit building to engage in electrical submetering.
Title
Municipally owned utilities. Provides that all rates, charges, and other fees for services rendered by a municipally owned utility (other than services rendered by a municipally owned sewer utility or by a department of public utilities for a consolidated city) to property occupied by someone other than the owner are payable by the person occupying the property if the account or other customer or billing records maintained by the utility for the property indicate that: (1) the property is occupied by someone other than the owner; and (2) the person occupying the property is responsible for paying the rates, charges, and fees. Provides that upon applying for utility service from a municipally owned utility, the person occupying the property shall provide the utility with the name and contact information of the owner or manager of the property. Provides that rates, charges, and fees assessed by a municipally owned utility with respect to property occupied by someone other than the owner do not constitute a lien against the property. Specifies that these provisions do not: (1) prohibit a municipal legislative body from imposing any requirement to: (A) ensure payment by; or (B) the creditworthiness of; the person occupying the property; or (2) abrogate or limit the authority of the owner of a multi-unit building to engage in electrical submetering.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Public Law 105 |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 476: yeas 75, nays 17 |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 388: yeas 42, nays 5 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Sandlin and Taylor G |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 83, nays 11 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Representatives Soliday and Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-31 | House | Representative Smaltz added as coauthor |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |