IN HB1346 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that in a county having a population of more than 300,000 but less than 400,000, a public question shall be held in the county at the 2014 general election on whether the executive and legislative structure of county government should be changed. Provides that if the public question is approved, the voters of the county shall not elect a board of county commissioners, but shall instead elect a single county executive to serve as the county executive and shall elect a county council that has the legislative and fiscal powers and duties of the county. Provides that in a county with a single county executive, the county council must consist of nine members elected from single-member districts (instead of four members elected from single-member districts and three members elected at large). Provides that if the office of single county executive becomes vacant, the county council shall appoint an individual to serve as interim single county executive until the office is filled. Provides that in a county that has abolished the board of county commissioners and has elected a single county executive, the county council may adopt an ordinance to change the county government structure back to a structure that includes: (1) the election of a board of county commissioners (instead of a single county executive); and (2) a county council in which four members are elected from single-member districts and three members are elected at large (instead of a county council in which all nine members are elected from single-member districts). Provides that if such an ordinance is adopted, a public question shall be held to determine whether the county government structure shall be changed back to a structure that includes the election of a board of county commissioners. Provides that

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County government issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions and Labor - Roll Call 134603 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 134601 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-24HouseSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 77
2014-03-12SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 404: yeas 40 and nays 8
2014-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 447: yeas 60 and nays 26
2014-03-10SenateSenator Holdman added as advisor
2014-03-10SenateSenator Arnold added as conferee
2014-03-10SenateSenator Wyss added as conferee
2014-03-10SenateSenator Arnold removed as advisor
2014-03-10SenateSenator Kruse removed as advisor
2014-03-10SenateSenator Tallian removed as conferee
2014-03-10SenateSenator Boots removed as conferee
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as coauthor.
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Moseley added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as conferee
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta removed as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Moseley removed as conferee
2014-03-10SenateSenator Broden added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Arnold added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Kruse added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Tallian added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Boots added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Bartlett added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Kersey added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Hamm added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Morris added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Gutwein added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Moseley added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Leonard added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 332: yeas 38 and nays 10
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1346 Amendment #6 (Tallian), failed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1346 Amendment #3 (Tallian), failed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1346 Amendment #4 (Tallian), failed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1346 Amendment #8 (Boots), prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 34, nays 10.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1346 Amendment #1 (Tallian), failed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1346 Amendment #7 (Boots), prevailed.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Pensions and Labor
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseSenator Kruse added as second sponsor.
2014-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Hamm added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 65 and nays 28
2014-01-28HouseSenator Boots added as sponsor.
2014-01-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Austin), failed.
2014-01-27HouseAmendment #2 (Kersey), failed.
2014-01-27HouseAmendment #3 (Pryor), failed.
2014-01-27HouseHB 1346 Amendment #12 (Moseley), failed.
2014-01-27HouseHB 1346 Amendment #15 (Riecken), failed.
2014-01-27HouseHB 1346 Amendment #18 (Leonard), prevailed.
2014-01-21HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions
2014-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Leonard.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1346/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/1/4/4014c5bb/HB1346.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/5/9/d9598218/HB1346.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/f/f/b9ff1292/HB1346.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/a/3/a7a3eb42/HB1346.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/6/c/176ca25e/HB1346.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/6/8/23688e55/HB1346.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/d/b/c8dbdd29/HB1346.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/8/6/e6863ecb/HB1346.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/b/3/28b30b8d/HB1346.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/6/c/fb6c0c63/HB1346.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/4/8/5d48819e/HB1346.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/2/d/192d1ee3/HB1346.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/e/f/a5ef7653/HB1346.02.COMH.53.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/3/f/563fbe78/HB1346.02.COMH.54.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/6/7/ff671301/HB1346.02.COMH.55.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/7/7/93773b6a/HB1346.02.COMH.56.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/5/8/2e58455c/HB1346.02.COMH.57.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/7/0/dd707471/HB1346.03.ENGH.99.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/5/8/c558a675/HB1346.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/6/d/f66d5a61/HB1346.05.ENGS.332.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/9/c/419cf487/HB1346.05.ENGS.447.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/2/1/6f21af54/HB1346.05.ENGS.404.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback