IN HB1342 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Telephone CPR instruction training. After July 1, 2020, requires an individual to complete a telephone cardiopulmonary resuscitation (T-CPR) training program (program) approved by the division of fire and building safety (division) if the individual: (1) answers 911 emergency medical telephone calls for a state or local law enforcement agency or fire protection agency, including a volunteer fire department (agency); and (2) is authorized by the agency's protocols to provide T-CPR instructions to a caller. Provides that the division may provide programs or third parties may provide programs that are approved by the division. Requires the division to: (1) adopt minimum standards for programs that meet or exceed evidence based nationally recognized emergency cardiovascular care guidelines; and (2) establish continuing education requirements. Allows the division to collect reasonable fees for providing programs and certifications that are deposited in the fire and building services fund. Sets forth certain requirements for a public safety answering point if a public safety answering point transfers a telephone caller to a public safety telecommunicator. Provides that a public safety telecommunicator who has completed a certified training program in emergency medical dispatch call handling is exempt from completing a T-CPR training program. Provides civil immunity for damages relating to the provision of T-CPR instruction. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone CPR instruction training. After July 1, 2020, requires an individual to complete a telephone cardiopulmonary resuscitation (T-CPR) training program (program) approved by the division of fire and building safety (division) if the individual: (1) answers 911 emergency medical telephone calls for a state or local law enforcement agency or fire protection agency, including a volunteer fire department (agency); and (2) is authorized by the agency's protocols to provide T-CPR instructions to a caller. Provides that the division may provide programs or third parties may provide programs that are approved by the division. Requires the division to: (1) adopt minimum standards for programs that meet or exceed evidence based nationally recognized emergency cardiovascular care guidelines; and (2) establish continuing education requirements. Allows the division to collect reasonable fees for providing programs and certifications that are deposited in the fire and building services fund. Sets forth certain requirements for a public safety answering point if a public safety answering point transfers a telephone caller to a public safety telecommunicator. Provides that a public safety telecommunicator who has completed a certified training program in emergency medical dispatch call handling is exempt from completing a T-CPR training program. Provides civil immunity for damages relating to the provision of T-CPR instruction. Makes a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePublic Law 54
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 408: yeas 90, nays 0
2019-04-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-19SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 45, nays 1
2019-03-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Becker, Crider and Melton
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 89, nays 0
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-05HouseRepresentatives Judy and Macer added as coauthors
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Summers added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1342/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/e/8/eae8707e/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/1/3/e2137441/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/6/3/3b636a12/HB1342.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/2/2/cb22d3b7/HB1342.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/f/d/e1fd3b6f/HB1342.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/6/3/bc63bc21/HB1342.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/5/4/28545d10/HB1342.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/5/c/db5cdc4c/HB1342.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/8/e/988e0cda/HB1342.160.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/b/d/98bd185f/HB1342.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/0/9/20099320/HB1342.273.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/d/d/47dd97cf/HB1342.408.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback