IN HB1342 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 249
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child in need of services. Removes a rebuttable presumption that a child is a child in need of services if a child is born with: (1) fetal alcohol syndrome; (2) neonatal abstinence syndrome; or (3) any amount of a controlled substance or legend drug in the child's body; and there is evidence that a child's mother used a controlled substance or legend drug during pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child in need of services. Removes a rebuttable presumption that a child is a child in need of services if a child is born with: (1) fetal alcohol syndrome; (2) neonatal abstinence syndrome; or (3) any amount of a controlled substance or legend drug in the child's body; and there is evidence that a child's mother used a controlled substance or legend drug during pregnancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 249
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 535: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 556: yeas 97, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSenator Crider added as conferee
2017-04-21SenateSenator Kenley removed as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer added as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Cherry removed as conferee
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Brown L and Taylor G
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Kenley and Breaux
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Siegrist and Stemler
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Cherry and Goodin
2017-04-06HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-06HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-03-29SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-03-28SenateSenator Mishler added as second sponsor
2017-03-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 311: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-03-27SenateSenators Niezgodski and Breaux added as cosponsors
2017-03-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-20SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-07HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kenley
2017-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 96, nays 0
2017-02-06HouseRepresentatives Stemler and Goodin added as coauthors
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-17HouseRepresentative Thompson added as coauthor
2017-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Cherry

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1342/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/4/9/6b49d401/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/0/5/1605ced7/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/1/3/e813082f/HB1342.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/4/2/4c427947/HB1342.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/0/1/2001c746/HB1342.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/9/f/fd9f9072/HB1342.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/f/c/2afc2654/HB1342.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/6/a/1d6a86b9/HB1342.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/2/4/be2414db/HB1342.72.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/8/e/ac8eb97b/HB1342.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/7/1/f671473b/HB1342.311.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/a/0/2ca0e58a/HB1342.535.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/0/2/0b02cfab/HB1342.556.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback