IN HB1342 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the hazardous waste disposal fee (which replaces the hazardous waste disposal tax), the fee on the disposal or incineration of solid waste, and the annual registration fee paid by owners of underground storage tanks shall be collected by the department of environmental management instead of the department of state revenue. Provides that 75% of the revenue from the hazardous waste disposal fee shall be deposited in the hazardous substance response fund and 25% shall be paid over to the county in which the hazardous waste is disposed of. Provides that: (1) 50% of the registration fees paid in connection with underground petroleum storage tanks and deposited in the petroleum trust fund shall be used to pay for corrective actions that involve releases of regulated substances from underground storage tanks that are not eligible to receive funds from the underground petroleum storage tank excess liability trust; and (2) not more than 11% of the funds expended for the corrective actions may be used to pay for administrative and personnel expenses incurred in carrying out the corrective actions. Allows the commissioner of the department of environmental management, under certain circumstances, to authorize the modification of a restrictive covenant that the owner of a property contaminated with a hazardous substance has been required to execute and record. Provides for the administrative and personnel expenses incurred by the state in evaluating a proposed modification of a restrictive covenant to be paid from the hazardous substances response trust fund, and requires the environmental rules board to adopt rules providing for the recovery of those expenses by the state. Removes references to the solid waste management board, which was abolished on January 1,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental fees and expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 134203 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 134201 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 220
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 410: yeas 89 and nays 0
2014-02-27SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-02-27SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 264: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-25SenateHB 1342 Amendment #4 (Charbonneau), prevailed.
2014-02-25SenateHB 1342 Amendment #3 (Charbonneau), prevailed.
2014-02-25SenateHB 1342 Amendment #2 (Breaux), prevailed.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Long removed second sponsor.
2014-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-30HouseSenator Long added as second sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseSenator Charbonneau added as sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-30HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 158: yeas 90 and nays 0
2014-01-29HouseHB 1342 Amendment #1 (Baird), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseHB 1342 Amendment #2 (Wolkins), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Wolkins.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1342/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/8/a/b08a1bca/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/2/8/4528ac00/HB1342.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/d/1/6fd1d14d/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/1/5/d5150f0e/HB1342.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/2/9/4129987b/HB1342.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/6/7/1567dc71/HB1342.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/2/7/65273b07/HB1342.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/1/7/86172f58/HB1342.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/0/0/10003224/HB1342.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/1/f/401f81d4/HB1342.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/f/4/5af48ac5/HB1342.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/d/1/8dd1c3d5/HB1342.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/c/1/b9c12a2a/HB1342.03.ENGH.158.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/e/b/88ebbbe2/HB1342.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/3/e/883e9c76/HB1342.05.ENGS.264.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/3/4/463475ef/HB1342.05.ENGS.410.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback