IN HB1341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 10:00 am in Room 233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Occupational safety and health. Creates a new civil penalty for certain occupational safety and health violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational safety and health. Creates a new civil penalty for certain occupational safety and health violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseRepresentatives Morris and Beck added as coauthors
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Busch
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback