IN HB1340 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Civil Law
Pending: Senate Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Civil proceeding advance payment transactions. Defines a "civil proceeding advance payment transaction", or "CPAP transaction", as a nonrecourse transaction in which a person (CPAP provider) provides to a consumer claimant in a civil proceeding a funded amount, the repayment of which is: (1) required only if the consumer claimant prevails in the civil proceeding; and (2) sourced from the proceeds of the civil proceeding. Requires a CPAP provider to register with the department of financial institutions (department). Sets forth requirements, including disclosure requirements, for a contract (CPAP contract) entered into by a CPAP provider and a consumer claimant. Sets forth

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil proceeding advance payment transactions. Defines a "civil proceeding advance payment transaction", or "CPAP transaction", as a nonrecourse transaction in which a person (CPAP provider) provides to a consumer claimant in a civil proceeding a funded amount, the repayment of which is: (1) required only if the consumer claimant prevails in the civil proceeding; and (2) sourced from the proceeds of the civil proceeding. Requires a CPAP provider to register with the department of financial institutions (department). Sets forth requirements, including disclosure requirements, for a contract (CPAP contract) entered into by a CPAP provider and a consumer claimant. Sets forth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Civil Law
2015-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-03HouseSenator Head added as sponsor
2015-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 69, nays 26
2015-02-02HouseAmendment #4 (Riecken) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-02HouseAmendment #3 (Washburne) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-02HouseAmendment #1 (Eberhart) motion withdrawn
2015-02-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-01-29HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-22HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
2015-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representative Austin
2015-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback