IN HB1337 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Planning and zoning. Provides that the legislative body (instead of the area board of zoning appeals) has final approval or disapproval of petitions for special exceptions or special uses (petitions) in a county that has an area plan commission. Provides that the transfer of authority to the legislative body does not affect a petition filed before July 1, 2021. Requires the legislative services agency to prepare legislation for introduction in the 2022 regular session of the general assembly to organize and correct statutes relating to the transfer of responsibilities. Provides that the advisory planning law does not authorize an ordinance or action of the advisory plan commission to prevent complete alienation of forests or agricultural uses outside the corporate boundaries of a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Tomes
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 60, nays 34
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #3 (Hostettler) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HousePlaced back on second reading
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Hostettler

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1337/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/a/f/d4afba5c/HB1337.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/4/c/3e4cb48f/HB1337.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/b/0/55b0a43a/HB1337.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/9/b/5c9be0fe/HB1337.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/1/7/32173880/HB1337.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/0/2/92028c7e/HB1337.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/c/2/8fc21ccf/HB1337.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/8/9/c7891b25/HB1337.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/8/7/95872a68/HB1337.02.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/7/b/b57b2d29/HB1337.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/0/5/370566b9/HB1337.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/0/d/e70d97f9/HB1337.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/d/4/44d46817/HB1337.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/f/1/f8f1891d/HB1337.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/9/5/53955fbc/HB1337.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/b/a/54ba0423/HB1337.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/a/a/9aaa4614/HB1337.219_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback