IN HB1335 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removal of public officers. Specifies that a "public officer", for purposes of the law concerning removal of public officers, includes an individual who holds an elected office or an appointed office of the state or a political subdivision. (Current law includes state, county, township, city, or town officials.)
Title
Removal of public officers. Specifies that a "public officer", for purposes of the law concerning removal of public officers, includes an individual who holds an elected office or an appointed office of the state or a political subdivision. (Current law includes state, county, township, city, or town officials.)
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Public Law 57 |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as second sponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Elections |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | House | Senator Grooms added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Stemler |