IN HB1332 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate advisors appointed: Walker and Niezgodski
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ambulatory surgical centers. Provides that ambulatory surgical centers may be reimbursed in an amount not to exceed 275% of the ambulatory surgical center's Medicare reimbursement rate. Provides that the payment to an ambulatory surgical center for a medical device under worker's compensation may not exceed the invoice amount plus 3%. Increases benefits for injuries and disablements by 2% each year for three years, beginning on July 1, 2020. Provides that a medical service facility may be reimbursed in an amount not to exceed 200% of the medical service facility's Medicare reimbursement rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ambulatory surgical centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Walker and Niezgodski
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Borders, Deal and Moseley
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehman and Beck
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #2 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseRepresentative Beck added as coauthor
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Boots and Tallian
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 91, nays 1
2020-01-30HouseAmendment #1 (Beck) failed; voice vote
2020-01-30HouseAmendment #2 (Barrett) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1332/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/e/1/a4e1da93/HB1332.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/c/4/adc4d978/HB1332.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/f/f/46ff08e2/HB1332.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/5/b/ba5ba4c1/HB1332.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/7/d/487d0df1/HB1332.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/3/c/c13c450a/HB1332.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/9/0/f9907b81/HB1332.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/5/2/e1525e71/HB1332.05.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/c/6/15c66e30/HB1332.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/a/1/03a1916e/HB1332.163_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/3/2/a232f0ee/HB1332.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/6/e/3a6eb353/HB1332.313_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback