IN HB1332 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Codifies the law concerning the office of small business and entrepreneurship. Transfers the small business development center, the small business ombudsman, and the young entrepreneurs program from the Indiana economic development corporation to the office of small business and entrepreneurship by removing or repealing the appropriate provisions in the Indiana economic development corporation law and recodifying them in the law concerning the lieutenant governor. Extends the young entrepreneurs program by two years. Makes conforming changes. Repeals the following chapters that are substantively similar to other chapters of the Indiana Code: (1) The promotion of livestock shows. (2) The promotion of foreign markets for agricultural products. (3) The promotion of aquaculture. (4) The inspection of grain moisture testing equipment. Repeals the community promotion program. Transfers money from the livestock industry promotion and development fund to the fund created in a similar chapter. Transfers money from the livestock export facility administration fund and the community development fund to the state general fund. Makes an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of small business and entrepreneurship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 133202 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 133202 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development - Roll Call 133201 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26HouseSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 187
2014-02-17SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-02-17SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 203: yeas 49 and nays 0
2014-02-13SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-11SenateSenator R. Young added as cosponsor.
2014-02-10SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-01-29HouseSenator Lanane added as second sponsor.
2014-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-28HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 98: yeas 94 and nays 0
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Davisson added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseSenator Yoder added as sponsor.
2014-01-27HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Austin added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Dermody added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2014-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Messmer.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1332/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/c/7/61c755c8/HB1332.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/7/f/fe7fda8b/HB1332.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/0/e/880e1818/HB1332.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/e/d/a4ed183b/HB1332.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/1/e/021e27e5/HB1332.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/a/d/1dada81a/HB1332.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/1/6/d61660a0/HB1332.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/f/7/b0f79eb6/HB1332.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/1/d/eb1da443/HB1332.02.COMH.98.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/7/7/7e773dbc/HB1332.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/b/2/43b2c0c2/HB1332.03.COMS.203.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback