IN HB1328 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 220: yeas 44, nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Subdividing land. Requires a unit to allow a property owner to subdivide the owner's property by deed if: (1) the owner requests a subdivision exemption; and (2) certain requirements are met. Requires the property owner to file an application with the plan commission accompanied by a plat drawing, the recorded deed of the parent parcel, and any application fee. Provides that the application must be reviewed and approved by the plan commission staff or the plan director, without a public hearing or the approval of the plan commission. Provides that approval of the application does not exempt the property owner from complying with any other requirements regarding construction of a new residential home, including obtaining a building permit. Provides that if the number of lots that are created by the subdivision make the provisions of the subdivision ordinance applicable, the property owner must comply with the ordinance, except for any provisions controlling lot size.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subdividing land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 220: yeas 44, nays 47
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Davisson
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Ellington

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1328/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/9/e/619eb9ed/HB1328.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/d/4/1ed4a5cc/HB1328.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/1/c/9e1c65c4/HB1328.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/c/1/73c1905b/HB1328.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/3/3/8133a899/HB1328.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/f/d/36fd2e36/HB1328.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/1/f/711f4f4a/HB1328.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/b/9/2eb9aee3/HB1328.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/d/e/49de084b/HB1328.220_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback