IN HB1328 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 278
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 278
2013-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-27SenateConference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 589: yeas 41, nays 9
2013-04-27SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 661: yeas 96, nays 2
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : withdrawn
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateSenator Pete Miller added as conferee
2013-04-26SenateSenator Mrvan removed as conferee
2013-04-15SenateSenate advisor appointed: Leising and Randolph
2013-04-15SenateSenate conferee appointed: Pat Miller and Mrvan
2013-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lucas, Clere, Pryor and Porter
2013-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: T. Brown and Goodin
2013-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 364: yeas 46 and nays 3
2013-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-21SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-03-21SenateSenator Mrvan added as cosponsor
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-02-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller
2013-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 79, nays 13
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 64, nays 34
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-11HouseRepresentative Battles added as coauthor
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2013-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-29HouseRepresentatives Clere and Goodin added as coauthors
2013-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative T. Brown

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1328
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1328.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1328.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1328.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1328.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1328.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1328.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1328.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0231.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0364.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0661.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0589.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback