IN HB1325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes criminal conversion of a leased motor vehicle a Class D felony instead of a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
Criminal conversion of leased motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 227 | |
2011-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 733: yeas 75, nays 20 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 522: yeas 40, nays 10 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-28 | Senator Lanane added as conferee | |
2011-04-28 | Senator Hume removed as conferee | |
2011-04-26 | Senate advisors appointed: Alting and Taylor | |
2011-04-26 | Senate conferee appointed: Merritt and Hume | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Davis, Culver and Austin | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Pelath | |
2011-04-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 45 and nays 5 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 3 (Grooms), prevailed; | |
2011-04-20 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-11 | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-02-03 | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Alting | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 91, nays 7 | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-25 | Representatives Saunders and Austin added as coauthors | |
2011-01-24 | Representative Pelath added as coauthor | |
2011-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-01-13 | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |