IN HB1320 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - HB 1320 Amendment #1 (Battles), prevailed.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - HB 1320 Amendment #1 (Battles), prevailed.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of education to establish a statewide student record repository of public school student achievement records to provide: (1) access to relevant student records to parents and school corporations; (2) for the transfer of student records between school corporations; and (3) a student data backup for school corporations. Prohibits an agency from releasing, selling, or otherwise transferring student information to the federal government or another entity unless all identifying information concerning students has been redacted or the general assembly has enacted legislation expressly authorizing the release, sale, or transfer. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor (up to one year imprisonment and a $5,000 fine).
Title
Student records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 132001 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 132001 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1320 Amendment #1 (Battles), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Motion to recommit; defeated; Roll Call #69; Yeas 27, Nays 68 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Behning. |