IN HB1319 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Acquisition of distressed utilities. Provides that a public water or wastewater utility that acquires the utility property of a "distressed utility" may petition the utility regulatory commission to include the "cost differential" associated with the acquisition as part of its rate base. Requires the commission to approve a petition under certain circumstances. Requires the commission to report annually to the interim study committee on energy, utilities, and telecommunications concerning such acquisitions. Requires the department of natural resources (department) to cooperate with the United States Geological Survey (USGS) to establish a program under which volunteers may monitor the water resource (which
Title
Acquisition of distressed utilities. Provides that a public water or wastewater utility that acquires the utility property of a "distressed utility" may petition the utility regulatory commission to include the "cost differential" associated with the acquisition as part of its rate base. Requires the commission to approve a petition under certain circumstances. Requires the commission to report annually to the interim study committee on energy, utilities, and telecommunications concerning such acquisitions. Requires the department of natural resources (department) to cooperate with the United States Geological Survey (USGS) to establish a program under which volunteers may monitor the water resource (which
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] |
Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 189 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 525: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 551: yeas 97, nays 1 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Tallian and Brown L |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Stoops |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: DeVon, McMillin, Pierce and Forestal |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Koch and Hale |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Delph added as third sponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 376: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |