IN HB1318 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections and clarifications. Specifies that an "eligible regional economic acceleration and development organization" means any of the following: (1) A development authority. (2) A qualified nonprofit organization. Resolves a conflict between House Bill 1623 and Senate Bill 400.
Title
Corrections and clarifications.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Timothy O'Brien [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Rodney Pol [D] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 225 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 539: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 566: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-27 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as conferee |
2023-04-27 | House | Representative Hatfield removed as conferee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senator Garten added as advisor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M and Brown L |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Buck and Taylor G |
2023-04-06 | House | House advisors appointed: Lehman, O'Brien and Garcia Wilburn |
2023-04-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Miller D and Hatfield |
2023-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-03-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as cosponsor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senator Pol added as third sponsor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second sponsor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2023-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Buck |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |
2023-01-12 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Bartels and O'Brien |