IN HB1318 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that on request of an individual who has applied for employment with a noncriminal justice organization or individual, the state police shall process a request for a national fingerprint based criminal history check of the individual from the Federal Bureau of Investigation's National Crime Information Center. (Current law provides that on request of an individual who has applied for employment with a noncriminal justice organization or individual, the state police shall process a request for a limited criminal history check of the individual.) Prohibits certain individuals with mental illnesses from possessing a firearm, and establishes a procedure to remove this prohibition after the person is released from commitment or has completed treatment.
Title
National fingerprint based criminal history checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 127 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 663: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Waterman and Tomes | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 99, nays 0 | |
2011-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2011-01-13 | Authored by Representative Borders |