IN HB1315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-14 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-14 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ballot security. Provides that after June 30, 2019, a county may not purchase new electronic voting systems, except for the purpose of enabling voters with disabilities to vote. Provides that after December 31, 2022, an electronic voting system may not be used in Indiana, except for the purpose of enabling voters with disabilities to vote. Provides for the January 1, 2023, expiration of certain statutes relating to electronic voting systems. Directs the elections interim study committee to prepare legislation to make any amendments to the Indiana Code the committee considers necessary to assist in the implementation of the phase out of electronic voting systems. Requires each county election board to conduct an audit after each general election in five randomly selected precincts in the county in which the election was held to determine whether the number of votes marked on ballots in the precinct matches the number of votes declared for the precinct. Requires the county election board to report the results of the audit for each precinct to the election division not later than January 1 after the election.
Title
Ballot security. Provides that after June 30, 2019, a county may not purchase new electronic voting systems, except for the purpose of enabling voters with disabilities to vote. Provides that after December 31, 2022, an electronic voting system may not be used in Indiana, except for the purpose of enabling voters with disabilities to vote. Provides for the January 1, 2023, expiration of certain statutes relating to electronic voting systems. Directs the elections interim study committee to prepare legislation to make any amendments to the Indiana Code the committee considers necessary to assist in the implementation of the phase out of electronic voting systems. Requires each county election board to conduct an audit after each general election in five randomly selected precincts in the county in which the election was held to determine whether the number of votes marked on ballots in the precinct matches the number of votes declared for the precinct. Requires the county election board to report the results of the audit for each precinct to the election division not later than January 1 after the election.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Dvorak |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1315/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/8/e/0e8e6570/HB1315.01.INTR.pdf |