IN HB1314 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Students in foster care and homeless students. Requires the state board of education to, in collaboration with the department of education (department) and the department of child services, annually prepare and submit the following: (1) A report on foster care youth educational outcomes. (2) A report on homeless youth educational outcomes. Requires the department to develop and submit a copy of the following: (1) A remediation plan concerning foster care youth. (2) A remediation plan concerning homeless youth. Requires certain information regarding students in foster care to be included in a school corporation's annual performance report. Requires the department and
Title
Students in foster care and homeless students. Requires the state board of education to, in collaboration with the department of education (department) and the department of child services, annually prepare and submit the following: (1) A report on foster care youth educational outcomes. (2) A report on homeless youth educational outcomes. Requires the department to develop and submit a copy of the following: (1) A remediation plan concerning foster care youth. (2) A remediation plan concerning homeless youth. Requires certain information regarding students in foster care to be included in a school corporation's annual performance report. Requires the department and
Sponsors
Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] |
Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Smith V) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Smith V) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Public Law 186 |
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 410: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 400: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Stoops, Kruse and Ruckelshaus |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Zay and Melton |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Behning, Wesco and Errington |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: DeVon and Summers |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Zay and Raatz |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 56: yeas 28, nays 65 |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment #4 (Smith V) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment #3 (Smith V) prevailed; Roll Call 55: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment #7 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Summers added as coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-11 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Behning and Frizzell |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative DeVon |