IN HB1312 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy robbery. Provides that the taking of a controlled substance from: (1) a pharmacist acting in an official capacity; or (2) a pharmacy; is robbery, a Level 4 felony. Provides that: (1) the use of a deadly weapon; or (2) causing bodily injury to any person other than the defendant; during the robbery of: (A) a pharmacist acting in an official capacity; or (B) a pharmacy; is a Level 2 felony. Provides that causing serious bodily injury to any person other than the defendant during a robbery of: (1) a pharmacist acting in an official capacity; or (2) a pharmacy;
Title
Pharmacy robbery. Provides that the taking of a controlled substance from: (1) a pharmacist acting in an official capacity; or (2) a pharmacy; is robbery, a Level 4 felony. Provides that: (1) the use of a deadly weapon; or (2) causing bodily injury to any person other than the defendant; during the robbery of: (A) a pharmacist acting in an official capacity; or (B) a pharmacy; is a Level 2 felony. Provides that causing serious bodily injury to any person other than the defendant during a robbery of: (1) a pharmacist acting in an official capacity; or (2) a pharmacy;
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Grooms |
2017-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 58, nays 38 |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Siegrist |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Negele |