IN HB1311 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 283
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Absentee ballots. Requires certain applications for an absentee ballot to be received not later than 11:59 p.m. 12 days before the date of an election. (Under current law, these applications must be received not later than 11:59 p.m. eight days before an election.) Allows certain applications for an absentee ballot to be transmitted by electronic mail. Provides that, for every election held after December 31, 2019, an application for an absentee ballot is an adequate application for an absentee ballot if it is received not earlier than December 1 of the year before any election. (Under current law, this provision

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots. Requires certain applications for an absentee ballot to be received not later than 11:59 p.m. 12 days before the date of an election. (Under current law, these applications must be received not later than 11:59 p.m. eight days before an election.) Allows certain applications for an absentee ballot to be transmitted by electronic mail. Provides that, for every election held after December 31, 2019, an application for an absentee ballot is an adequate application for an absentee ballot if it is received not earlier than December 1 of the year before any election. (Under current law, this provision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Amendment #5 (Austin) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePublic Law 283
2019-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 465: yeas 65, nays 32
2019-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 308: yeas 37, nays 9
2019-03-21SenateAmendment #3 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-21SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 297: yeas 7, nays 39
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Houchin added as second sponsor
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseRepresentative Boy removed as coauthor
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 63, nays 28
2019-02-12HouseAmendment #5 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 143: yeas 29, nays 63
2019-02-12HouseAmendment #3 (Boy) failed; voice vote
2019-02-12HouseAmendment #2 (Pryor) failed; voice vote
2019-02-12HouseAmendment #1 (Hamilton) ruled out of order
2019-02-12HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04HouseRepresentative Manning added as coauthor
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Boy added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Cherry
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Saunders

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1311/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/8/1/fe81f9c5/HB1311.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/1/0/7e10a82c/HB1311.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/d/d/acdda45e/HB1311.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/0/f/980fb7c7/HB1311.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/9/4/699449bf/HB1311.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/c/6/b0c65063/HB1311.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/b/4/0ab4c18f/HB1311.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/9/f/ad9f8c7a/HB1311.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/6/b/706bc25c/HB1311.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/4/0/f940f809/HB1311.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/3/d/a03d6d7f/HB1311.142.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/4/d/f84d642a/HB1311.143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/2/b6420eed/HB1311.207.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/f/3/46f34c5e/HB1311.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/4/1/7041dabc/HB1311.297.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/e/5/37e5f207/HB1311.308.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/1/c/291c442c/HB1311.465.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback