IN HB1311 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage issues. Requires brewers that are permitted to sell beer by the glass to make food available for consumption on the brewery premises. (Current law requires brewers that are permitted to sell beer by the glass to furnish the minimum food requirements as prescribed by the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission)). Provides that the holder of a farm winery permit or a small brewer's permit that provides only wine or beer by the glass at a festival, fair, or other temporary location and does not provide food: (1) is exempt from the sanitation requirements governing food establishments; and (2)
Title
Alcoholic beverage issues. Requires brewers that are permitted to sell beer by the glass to make food available for consumption on the brewery premises. (Current law requires brewers that are permitted to sell beer by the glass to furnish the minimum food requirements as prescribed by the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission)). Provides that the holder of a farm winery permit or a small brewer's permit that provides only wine or beer by the glass at a festival, fair, or other temporary location and does not provide food: (1) is exempt from the sanitation requirements governing food establishments; and (2)
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 144 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 510: yeas 86, nays 5 |
2015-04-20 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 444: yeas 46, nays 4 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Alting added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 87, nays 7 |
2015-02-23 | House | Amendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Dermody, Forestal, Macer |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |